MS SB2655 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-153-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Mississippi Community College Board To Designate One Or More Workforce Development Centers At The Request Of Affiliated Community Or Junior Colleges To Provide Skills Training To Individuals To Enhance Their Ability To Be Employed In The Motion Picture Industry In This State; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Community College Board; require designation of 3 workforce development centers to provide motion picture skills training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-30 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-30 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Bell,Shirley,Mettetal | |
2012-04-24 | Conferees Named Horhn,Fillingane,Doty | |
2012-04-19 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-13 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-10 | Amended | |
2012-04-03 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Referred To Workforce Development | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-08 | Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-29 | DR - TSDPCS: EC To FI | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Economic Development;Finance |