MS SB2659 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Mississippi Community Oriented Policing Services In Schools (mcops) Grant Program In The State Department Of Education To Assist Law Enforcement Agencies In Providing Additional School Resource Officers To Engage In Community Policing In And Around Primary And Secondary Schools; To Prescribe Requirements And Standards For The Program; To Authorize The Local School Board Of Public School Districts, Which Are Unable To Meet The Financial Requirements For Participation In The Mcops Program, To Develop A Plan For The Security Of Its Students, Faculty And Administration, Which Must Be Approved By The State Board Of Education And The Mississippi Department Of Public Safety, And To Provide That The School Board May Apply For Grants Under The Mcops Program For Training Of Security Personnel Employed By The School District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Community Oriented Policing Services in Schools (MCOPS) grant program; establish in the State Department of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 79 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 75 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 79 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 75 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Guice,Currie |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Collins,Burton |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-03-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Myers, Moore, Clarke) |
2013-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To ED |
2013-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-29 | Senate | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |