MS SB2674 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-26-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Continuing Education For Community Public Water System Board Members; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Community public water systems; require continuing education for board members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Amended |
2020-06-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Energy |