MS SB2675 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 12, Chapter 441, Laws Of 2015, To Extend The Automatic Repealer On The Education Scholarship Account (esa) Program; To Amend Section 37-181-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Participating Student In An Esa Program May Return To The Home School District And The Esa Funds Shall Follow The Student; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Scholarship Account (ESA) program; extend repealer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Motion to Recommit Lost (Y: 11 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseDied In Committee
2019-02-20HouseReferred To Education
2019-02-19SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-14SenatePassed As Amended
2019-02-14SenateMotion to Recommit Lost
2019-02-14SenateAmended
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback