MS SB2696 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 81-18-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "qualifying Individual" As Used In The Mississippi S.a.f.e. Mortgage Act; To Amend Section 81-18-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Contents Of The Mortgage Broker And Lender Applications And To Increase The Initial Loan Originator License Fee; To Amend Section 81-18-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete Certain Licensing Procedures And Criteria; To Amend Section 81-18-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The License And Renewal Fees For Mortgage Brokers, Mortgage Lenders And Loan Originators; To Amend Section 81-18-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Branch License And Renewal Fees; To Amend Section 81-18-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Examination Fee Which May Be Charged By The Commissioner Of Banking For The Examination Of The Books And Records Of Any Licensee; To Amend Section 81-18-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Licensees Who Are Involved In Civil Actions To Notify The Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System And Registry; To Amend Section 81-18-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Each Licensee To Maintain A Journal Of Serviced Loans At Its Principal Place Of Business For All Mississippi Residential Loans That The Licensee Owns And/or Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi S.A.F.E. Mortgage Act; make various amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Reconsidered |
2013-03-04 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Guice, Zuber, Carpenter) |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-01 | House | Amended |
2013-02-28 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2013-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |