MS SB2696 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 47-5-24, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Minimum Qualifications For The Commissioner Of Corrections; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections; revise qualifications for commissioner and bring forward sections on parole and jails.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 97 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 96 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Approved by Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-29HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-26HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-26SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-22HouseConferees Named Horan,Bain,Yates
2020-06-23SenateConferees Named Barnett,DeBar,Sparks
2020-06-18SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-17HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-16HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-16HouseAmended
2020-06-09HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-09HouseDR - TSDPAA: AP To CN
2020-06-03HouseDR - TSDPAA: CN To AP
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Corrections;Appropriations
2020-03-13SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-12SenatePassed
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-17SenateReferred To Corrections

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/SB/SB2696.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2696IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2696CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2696PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2696SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/SB2696_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/0660011.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1620004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1750010.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1750033.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback