MS SB2698 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Failed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create A Mississippi Veterans Honor Medal Program To Honor, Recognize And Thank Mississippi Veterans For Their Honorable Military Service; To Provide That The State Veterans Affairs Board May Adopt Any Rules And Regulations Necessary To Administer This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans; create the Mississippi Veterans Honor Medal Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseDied On Calendar
2019-02-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Military Affairs
2019-02-14SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-12SenatePassed As Amended
2019-02-12SenateAmended
2019-02-12SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-30SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Veterans and Military Affairs

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback