MS SB2716 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 89-7-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify When A Complaint For Eviction Is Triable; To Amend Sections 89-7-35, 89-7-41 And 89-7-45, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify When A Warrant For Eviction Is To Be Issued And When A Stay Of Execution Is Or Is Not Appropriate; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord/tenant act; clarify eviction and stay of proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 73 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Approved by Governor
2019-03-19HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-13HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-12HousePassed
2019-02-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Judiciary A
2019-02-11SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-08SenatePassed
2019-02-08SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback