MS SB2716 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-5-52, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Mississippi Department Of Transportation To Issue Forestry Permits To Vehicles Of A Certain Size For The Transporting Of Forestry-related Equipment; To Set An Annual Fee Of $200.00 Per Pulling Unit For The Permit; To Describe The Activities For Which The Permit Is Available; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Forestry permits; allow MDOT to issue for transporting of forestry-related equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-12 | House | Passed |
2020-06-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-04 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To FO |
2020-05-27 | House | DR - TSDP: FO To TR |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Forestry;Transportation |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |