MS SB2723 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 49-7-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Commission On Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Extend The Open Season On Deer, When It Ends On A Friday, To 30 Minutes After Sunset On The Following Sunday; To Amend Section 49-7-31.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Commission To Extend The Open Seasons On Bobwhite Quail And Wild Turkey, When They End On Friday, To 30 Minutes After Sunset On The Following Sunday; To Amend Section 49-7-31.3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Commission To Extend The Open Seasons On Squirrel And Rabbits, When They End On Friday, To 30 Minutes After Sunset On The Following Sunday; To Amend Section 49-7-31.4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Commission To Extend The Open Season On Fur-bearing Animals, Including Any Additional Open Season On Raccoon, When It Ends On A Friday, To 30 Minutes After Sunset On The Following Sunday; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on WFP; allow to extend open seasons ending Friday until 30 minutes after sunset on Sunday.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10 Approved by Governor
2020-06-03HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-03SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-05-29HouseReturned For Enrolling
2020-05-28HousePassed
2020-05-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
2020-03-05SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-04SenatePassed
2020-03-04SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-02-20SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-17SenateReferred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback