MS SB2728 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 49-17-14, 49-17-16, 49-17-30 And 49-17-32, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For More Efficient Management Of The Air Operating Permit Program Fee Trust Fund; To Provide For Changes To The Title V Fee System Such That Sufficient Funds Are Collected Through An Equitable Fee System For The Title V Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Air Operating Permit Program Fee Trust Fund; provide for more efficient management of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-16 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (20th), Clark) |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed |
2020-06-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EP To FI |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Environment Prot, Cons and Water Res;Finance |