MS SB2737 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 23-15-551 And 23-15-691, Mississippi Code Of 1972, By Deleting The Option Of Marking Election Ballots With Indelible Pencil; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Marking election ballots; delete option of using indelible pencil to mark ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Vetoed | |
2020-06-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed |
2020-06-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Elections |