MS SB2744 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 1-3-42, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Terms Describing Photo Identification That Is Legal In This State; To Create New Section 97-7-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Crime Of Counterfeiting, Fraud Or Misrepresentation In Relation To A Tribal Identification Card; To Amend Section 27-115-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Age To Buy A Lottery Ticket; To Amend Section 45-9-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity For A Concealed Carry License; To Amend Section 49-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity To Obtain A Hunting Or Fishing License; To Amend Section 63-21-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity Required For Scrap Sales; To Amend Section 67-3-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Proof Of Identity For Purchase Of Alcohol; To Amend Section 75-9-503, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity In Ucc Filing Statements; To Amend Section 75-24-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Personally Identifying Information That Can Be Compromised In A Security Breach; To Amend Section 75-67-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identify For Pawnshop Transactions; To Amend Section 75-95-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity Required For Precious Item Resale; To Amend Section 93-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Age Required To Obtain A Marriage License; To Amend Section 93-29-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Factors To Determine Risk Of Abduction; To Amend Section 97-17-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Proof Of Identity Required For Scrap Sales; To Amend Section 97-45-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Definition Of Personal Information In The Contest Of Certain Computer Crimes; To Amend Section 45-35-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Dealing With Fraudulent Nondriver Identification Cards To Make A Technical Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tribal identification cards; recognize as legal means of personal identification.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Charles Younger [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |