MS SB2752 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-13-134, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Department Of Education And The State Department Of Health To Establish A School Health Pilot Program Based Upon Appropriate Science-based Wellness Policies; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Coordinated School Health Pilot Program based on federal model; authorize SDE and SDH to establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-30 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-30 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-26 | Conferees Named Moore,Barker,Clarke | |
2012-04-24 | Conferees Named Tollison,Collins,Wilemon | |
2012-04-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-11 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-10 | Amended | |
2012-04-03 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-04-03 | DR - TSDPAA: AP To ED | |
2012-03-28 | DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP | |
2012-03-14 | Referred To Education;Appropriations | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-07 | Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-28 | DR - TSDP: ED To AP | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Education;Appropriations |