MS SB2778 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Dui Transparency Act; To Amend Section 63-1-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Jurisdiction For Appeal Of Driver's License Suspension Lies In The Circuit Or County Court; To Create New Section 63-1-58, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Suspension Or Restriction Of Driving Privileges Run Consecutively And Not Concurrently; To Amend Section 63-11-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Section 63-11-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Appeal Of License Suspension And To Clarify Administrative Suspension For Test Refusal And Upon Conviction Or Nonadjudication; To Amend Section 63-11-30, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Offense Of Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol Or Other Drugs; To Amend Section 63-11-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Requirement Of Installation And Maintenance Of Ignition-interlock Devices, To Place The Responsibility To Determine Indigence On The Trial Court, And To Authorize Drug Testing Of Certain Violators; To Amend Section 63-11-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Court Clerks To Submit Charging And Disposition Information To The Department Of Public Safety In A Timely Manner; To Amend Section 63-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Require Law Enforcement Officers To Perform Ncic Checks And Note Results; To Repeal Sections 63-11-49, 63-11-51 And 63-11-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Seizure, Forfeiture And Disposition Of Proceeds Of Vehicles Used In A Third Or Subsequent Dui Violation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
DUI Transparency Act; create.
Sponsors
Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Bill Stone [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Sen. Chris Massey [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 87 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 87 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-19 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-13 | House | Conferees Named Willis,Hood,Horan |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conferees Named Tindell,Parker,Hopson |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-28 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-25 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-25 | House | Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Drug Policy |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |