MS SB2790 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Require Its Contractors To Provide Work Zone Safety Operations; To Authorize The Commission's Contractors To Enter Into Agreements With State And Local Law Enforcement Agencies To Provide Work Zone Safety Operations; To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of Any Municipality And County To Enter Into An Agreement With Private Entities To Provide Law Enforcement Services For The Purposes Of Performing Security And Traffic Control Operations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Transportation Commission; authorize to require its contractors to provide work zone safety operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Transportation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |