MS SB2795 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Women's Health Defense Act Of 2013; To Declare Certain Findings Of The Legislature; To Make It Unlawful To Knowingly Provide Or Prescribe Any Abortion-inducing Drug To A Pregnant Woman For The Purpose Of Inducing An Abortion In That Pregnant Woman Unless The Person Who Provides Or Prescribes The Abortion-inducing Drug Is A Physician, And The Provision Or Prescription Of The Abortion-inducing Drug Satisfies The Standard Of Care; To Require The Physician Providing Or Prescribing Any Abortion-inducing Drug To Schedule A Follow-up Visit For The Woman At Approximately 14 Days After Administration Of The Abortion-inducing Drug To Provide Treatment That Meets The Standard Of Care; To Require Physicians Who Provide An Abortion-inducing Drug To Another For The Purpose Of Inducing An Abortion To Report Those Actions To The State Department Of Health And To Report Adverse Events From The Use Of The Abortion-inducing Drug To The Fda; To Provide That A Person Who Intentionally, Knowingly Or Recklessly Violates Any Provision Of This Act Is Guilty Of A Misdemeanor; To Provide That All Remedies Under The Statutory Laws Of This State Are Available If There Is Failure To Comply With The Requirements Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Women's Health Defense Act of 2013; create.
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Phillip Gandy [R] | Sen. Billy Hudson [R] | Sen. Tony Smith [R] |
Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 84 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 75 N: 33 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 84 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 75 N: 33 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Gipson,Crawford |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Fillingane,Wiggins |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-07 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-03-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Mims, Barker) |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Amended |
2013-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |