MS SB2835 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "mississippi First Responders Health And Safety Act"; To Provide That When A First Responder Who Has Completed A Certain Number Of Years Of Service Is Unable To Perform His Or Her Regular Duties By Reason Of Cancer, The Affected First Responder Or His Beneficiaries Shall Be Entitled To All Rights And Benefits As Granted By This Act; To Amend Section 71-3-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi First Responders Health and Safety Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Approved by Governor
2019-04-03HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-03SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-22HouseConferees Named Ford,Hale,DeLano
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Carmichael,Clarke,Carter
2019-03-19SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-15HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseRead the Third Time
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-03-05HouseDR - TSDPAA: AP To IN
2019-03-04HouseDR - TSDPAA: IN To AP
2019-02-21HouseReferred To Insurance;Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-07SenatePassed As Amended
2019-02-07SenateAmended
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-02-04SenateDR - TSDPCS: IN To AP
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Insurance;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/SB/SB2835.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2835IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2835CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2835PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2835SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SB2835_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2835_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2835_H_Amend_01_to_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2835_H_Amend_02.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0310024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0650016.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0810005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0810005.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback