MS SB2853 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-43-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Service Of Notice Of A Tax Sale To Include Service By A Constable; To Bring Forward Section 27-45-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Service of tax sale notices; revise to allow service by a constable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Byrd,Taylor,Smith |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Hill,McCaughn,Whaley |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-10 | House | Amended |
2020-06-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To County Affairs |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To County Affairs |