MS SB2855 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 19-11-17, 21-35-17 And 27-104-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt Unfunded Liability For Employee Retirement Funds From The Requirement That County, Municipal And State Budget Estimates Shall Not Be Exceeded; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State, county and municipal budget estimates shall not be exceeded; exempt unfunded liability for employee retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Read,Huddleston (15th),Bounds |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Burton |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-06 | House | Amended |
2018-03-06 | House | Reconsidered |
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Bain, Read, Huddleston (15th)) |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Amended |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |