MS SB2867 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To Defray The Expenses Of The Department Of Mental Health And Certain Programs Of The Division Of Alcohol And Drug Abuse, For Fiscal Year 2016.
Title
Appropriation; Mental Health, Department of.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] |
Sen. Nancy Adams Collins [R] | Sen. Phillip Gandy [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-29 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Mims,Currie |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,McDaniel,Burton |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-16 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-16 | House | Amended |
2015-03-13 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |