MS SB2905 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Chapter 878, Local And Private Laws Of 1990, As Last Amended By Chapter 922, Local And Private Laws Of 2017, Which Creates The Hattiesburg Tourism Commission And Authorizes A Tax On The Gross Proceeds Of Hotels And Motels From Overnight Room Rentals To Fund The Commission, To Correct Certain Errors Referencing The County Instead Of The City; To Extend Until July 1, 2022, The Repeal Date Of The Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Hattiesburg; correct errors referencing county instead of city, and extend repealer on tourism tax and commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Approved by Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-26HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-26SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-26HouseConferees Named Barton,Gibbs (36th),Steverson
2020-06-25SenateConferees Named McMahan,Tate,Johnson
2020-06-25SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-24HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-23HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-23HouseAmended
2020-06-23HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-23HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation
2020-06-22SenateTransmitted To House
2020-06-18SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-18SenateAmended
2020-06-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-28SenateReferred To Local and Private

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/SB/SB2905.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2900-2999/SB2905IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2900-2999/SB2905PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2900-2999/SB2905SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/SB2905_S_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/SB2905_H_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1640011.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1690006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1740028.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1750010.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback