MS SB2921 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Jessica Sibley Upshaw Food Bank And Food Pantry Sales Tax Relief Act; To Amend Section 27-65-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By Senate Bill No. 2425, 2014 Regular Session, To Exempt From Sales Taxation The Sale Of Nonperishable Food Items To Certain Charitable Organizations That Operate A Food Bank Or Food Pantry Or Food Lines; To Exempt From Sales Taxation Sales Of Tangible Personal Property Or Services To National Association Of Junior Auxiliaries, Inc.; To Exempt From Sales Taxation The Sale Of Tangible Personal Property And Services To The United Way Of The Pine Belt Region, Inc.; To Exempt From Sales Taxation Sales Of Tangible Personal Property And Services To The Mississippi Children's Museum; To Exempt From Sales Taxation Sales Of Tangible Personal Property Or Services To The Jackson Zoological Park; To Exempt From Sales Taxation Sales To Tangible Personal Property Or Services To The Hattiesburg Zoo; To Exempt From Sales Taxation Gross Proceeds From Sales Of Food, Merchandise Or Other Concessions At An Event Held Solely For Religious Or Charitable Purposes At Livestock Facilities, Agriculture Facilities Or Other Facilities Constructed, Renovated Or Expanded With Funds For The Grant Program Authorized Under Section 18, Chapter 530, Laws Of 1995; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales taxation; exempt sales to the Mississippi Children's Museum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Mayo |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Longwitz |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-18 | House | Amended |
2014-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred To Finance |