MS SB2955 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation Of Special Funds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi State Board Of Examiners For Licensed Professional Counselors For Fiscal Year 2021.
Title
Appropriation; Counselors, Board of Examiners for Licensed Professional.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Benjamin Suber [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-23 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,Huddleston |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Butler,Suber |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-16 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-15 | House | Amended |
2020-06-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-02 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Passed |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |