MS SB2956 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Partially Vetoed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Partially Vetoed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning For The Support And Maintenance Of Financial Aid Scholarship, Loan And Grant Programs And The Mississippi Office Of Student Financial Aid, For Fiscal Year 2018.
Title
Appropriation; IHL - Student Financial Aid.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Videt Carmichael [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Gary Jackson [R] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 98 N: 5 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Partially Vetoed By Governor | |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Read,Beckett,Mettetal |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,McDaniel |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-13 | House | Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |