MS SB2957 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning For Support Of The Eight Universities For Fiscal Year 2013; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; IHL - General support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-29 | Reconsidered | |
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-28 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2012-04-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Frierson,Beckett,Flaggs | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Burton | |
2012-04-19 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-18 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-18 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (70th), Frierson, Huddleston (15th)) | |
2012-04-12 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-12 | Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-29 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-26 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-03-26 | Amended | |
2012-03-22 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-22 | Referred To Appropriations |