MS SB2968 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The Office Of State Aid Road Construction Of The Mississippi Department Of Transportation For Fiscal Year 2019.
Title
Appropriation; Transportation, Department of - State Aid Road Construction, Office of.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-25 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-24 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Read,Busby,Massengill |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Simmons (13th),Burton |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-12 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Amended |
2018-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |