MS SB2983 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Coahoma County, Mississippi, To Contribute Up To $15,000.00 Annually To But God Ministries; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Coahoma County; authorize board of supervisors to contribute to But God Ministries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-25 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-24 | House | Passed |
2020-06-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |