MS SB2995 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation Of Special Funds To Defray The Expenses Of The Mississippi Fair Commission, The Mississippi Livestock Coliseum, And The Industrial Showcase And Trade Mart Building For Fiscal Year 2018.
Title
Appropriation; Fair and Coliseum Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Videt Carmichael [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sean Tindell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-24 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Read,Sullivan,Huddleston (15th) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Carmichael,Gollott |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-13 | House | Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |