MS SB2999 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For Expenses Of The Executive Department, Being The Governor's Office And Staff, And For Expenses Incidental To The Proper Operation Of The Governor's Mansion And Residence Of The Governor For Fiscal Year 2018.
Title
Appropriation; Governor's Office and Mansion.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] |
Sen. J.P. Wilemon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Read,Snowden,Arnold |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Burton,Wiggins |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-13 | House | Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |