MS SB3044 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-14)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-14)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The "equity In Distance Learning Act" To Be Administered By The Mississippi Department Of Education To Provide Guidance, Technical Support And Financial Reimbursement To Schools To Provide Distance Learning And Online Services; To Provide For Certain Transfers By The State Fiscal Officer; To State Legislative Findings And Intent; To Define Terms; To Establish The "equity In Distance Learning Grant Program"; To Provide That Allocations Under The Program Shall Be Made Based On Average Daily Membership; To Highly Encourage Each School To Commit A Portion Of Its Federal Elementary And Secondary School Emergency Relief (esser) Funds To Purchase Equipment For Its Distance Learning Plan; To Require The Department To Inform Each School Of Its Portion Of Available Funds, To Develop Regulations And Procedures To Govern The Grant Program, And To Compile An Express Products List; To Prescribe The Eligibility Requirements For Schools To Be Reimbursed Under The Grant Program; To Create A Special Fund In The State Treasury To Be Known As The "equity In Distance Learning Fund"; To Amend Section 31-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Purchases Under The Grant Program Created Under This Act And The Directive That School Districts Create A Distance Learning Plan And Fulfill Technology Needs Expeditiously Shall Be Deemed An Emergency Purchase For Purposes Of The Procurement And Competitive Bidding Law; To Provide That The Provisions Of This Act Are Severable; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Equity in Distance Learning Act; enact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-07-01 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-07-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-07-01 | House | Amended |
2020-07-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2020-06-17 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69 |