MS SB3061 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Prentiss County, Mississippi, The Board Of Supervisors Of Tishomingo County, Mississippi, And The Board Of Supervisors Of Alcorn County, Mississippi, To Authorize The Expenditure Of Funds From Each County's Inmate Canteen Fund To Purchase Equipment And Supplies That Benefit Inmates Incarcerated In The County Jail In Addition To The Purchases Authorized By Section 19-3-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Prentiss County; authorize certain expenditures from the county's Inmate Canteen Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2018-03-26 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-24 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-24 | House | Amended |
2018-03-24 | House | Reconsidered |
2018-03-23 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Carpenter, Barton, Jackson) |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |