MS SB3171 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Payment Of Service Charges To Banks For Acting As Agents Of The State In Paying Full Faith And Credit Bonds And Interest Of The State Of Mississippi, From The Effective Date Of This Act Until Such Bonds Shall Be Paid Or Until June 30, 2011, Whichever Shall First Occur; And For The Payment Of Maturing Bonds And Interest On The Full Faith And Credit Bonds Of The State Of Mississippi Falling Due During Fiscal Year 2011.
Title
Appropriation; Debt Service-Bank Ser. Charge.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Carl Gordon [D] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [D] | Sen. Ezell Lee [D] |
Sen. Alan Nunnelee [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 98 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 98 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-04-20 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 121 | |
2010-03-19 | Conferees Named Stringer,Flaggs,Hines | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Nunnelee,Gordon,Hyde-Smith | |
2010-03-17 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-10 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2010-02-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-23 | Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Appropriations |