MS SC501 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Life And Public Service Of Bradford Johnson Dye, Jr., Long-time Legislator And Former Lieutenant Governor From Charleston, Mississippi, And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Legislature.
Title
Mourn the loss of Brad Dye and commend service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-08-29 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-08-29 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-08-29 | House | Adopted |
2018-08-29 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-08-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Referred To Rules |