MS SC503 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Condolences Of The Mississippi Legislature To The Bereaved Family Of Goodwill Ambassador Paul Ott Carruth Of Lake Dixie Springs, Mississippi, Who Reached Millions Of Students And Citizens With His Message About Wildlife Conservation And Family Values.
Title
Extend condolences of Legislature to the family of Mississippi's Goodwill Ambassador Paul Ott Carruth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-08-29 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-08-29 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-08-29 | House | Adopted |
2018-08-29 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-08-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Referred To Rules |