MS SC544 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Designating April 13-19, 2020, As "mississippi Mosquito And West Nile Virus Awareness Week."
Title
Designate April 13-19, 2020, as "Mississippi Mosquito and West Nile Virus Awareness Week."
Sponsors
Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Sen. Philip Moran [R] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-27 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |