MS SC545 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Urging Congress To Hear The Concerns Of The State Of Mississippi Regarding The Bonnet CarrÉ Disaster And To Work Collaboratively With The State To Find Long-term Solutions For The Prevention Of Future Disasters Created By Freshwater Releases Into The Mississippi Sound.
Title
Bonnet Carré Spillway; urge Congress to work collaboratively with the state to find long-term solutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-27 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |