MS SC556 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute And Extending The Appreciation Of The Legislature To Former Jackson State University President Dr. John Arthur Peoples, Jr., And Mrs. Mary Peoples For Their Legacy Of Contributions To Higher Education In The State Of Mississippi.
Title
Recognize former JSU President Dr. John Arthur Peoples, Jr., and Mrs. Mary Peoples for contributions to higher education in MS.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Blackmon [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. Tammy Witherspoon [D] | Sen. Joseph Thomas [D] | Sen. David Blount [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-23 | House | Adopted |
2020-06-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |