MS SC564 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Congratulating Olympian And Former Ole Miss Track And Field Star Sam Kendricks For Winning His Fifth-straight Usa Outdoor Pole Vault Title.
Title
Recognize Olympian and former Ole Miss Track and Field Star Sam Kendricks for winning his fifth-straight Pole Vault Title.
Sponsors
Sen. Gray Tollison [D] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |