MS SC565 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Passing Of Retired Mississippi Supreme Court Chief Justice Lenore Loving Prather Of Columbus, Mississippi, And Commending Her Career As The First Woman To Serve As A Mississippi Supreme Court Justice.
Title
Mourn the passing of retired MS Supreme Court Chief Justice Lenore Prather and commend her service as the first female Justice.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Younger [R] | Sen. Sally Doty [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Gary Jackson [R] |
Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-23 | House | Adopted |
2020-06-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Rules |