MS SC578 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Life And Public Service Of Former Senator And Representative Malcolm Mabry, Jr., Of Dublin, Mississippi, And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Legislature.
Title
Commend life and public service of former Senator and Representative Malcolm Mabry of Dublin, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Joseph Thomas [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Sen. Tyler McCaughn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-26 | House | Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |