MS SC583 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Commending Talking Book Services, The Statewide Library Service For Mississippians With Visual, Physical Or Organic Reading Disabilities, Which Is Housed At The Mississippi Library Commission, On 50 Years Of Service On July 1, 2020.
Title
Recognize 50th Anniversary of Talking Book Services at the MS Library Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |