MS SC584 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on August 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on August 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute To The Life Of Iconic Vicksburg Physician Dr. William Briggs Hopson, Jr., A Pillar In The Mississippi Health-care Community, And Extending The Deepest Sympathy Of The Mississippi Legislature To His Family.
Title
Commend the life of iconic physician Dr. William Briggs Hopson, Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-07-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | House | Adopted |
2020-07-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |