MS SC585 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Distinguished Career And Meritorious Service Of Dr. Vernon Clyde Muse As President Of Hinds Community College And Congratulating Him Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement On June 30, 2020, After 42 Years Of Outstanding Service.
Title
Commend career and distinguished service of Dr. Clyde Muse upon the occasion of his retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-07-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | House | Adopted |
2020-07-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |