MS SC664 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Pearl River Community College (prcc) "wildcats" Men's Basketball Team And Coach Chris Oney For Winning The Macjc State Championship And For Their First-ever Appearance In The National Junior College Athletic Association (njcaa) Tournament.
Title
Congratulate PRCC "Wildcats" Men's Basketball Team for winning State Championship and first-ever National (NJCAA) Tournament.
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Philip Moran [R] |
Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Died On Calendar |
2019-03-29 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |