MS SR52 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-28 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-28 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commemorating And Recognizing The Historical Significance Of June 19, 2020, As "juneteenth."
Title
Commemorate June 19, 2020, as "Juneteenth."
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Blackmon [D] | Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. David Blount [D] |
Sen. Chris Caughman [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Referred To Rules |