MS SR56 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-01 - Immediate Release
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-01 - Immediate Release
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The 2019-2020 Pine Grove High School Lady Panthers Basketball Team And Coach Katie Bates Upon Winning The 2020 Mhsaa Class 1a State Basketball Championship And The Team's Fourth Consecutive Class 1a State Basketball Championship.
Title
Commend Pine Grove High School Lady Panthers Basketball Team on winning fourth consecutive Class 1A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |