MT HB1 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Feed Bill to fund 66th Legislative session and prepare for 2021
Title
Feed Bill to fund 66th Legislative session and prepare for 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Glimm [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-01-28 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-01-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-01-24 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Fish and Game |
2019-01-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-01-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-01-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-01-14 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-11 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-01-11 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-09 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-01-09 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Appropriations |
2018-12-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2018-12-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-14 | House | (H) Introduced |
2018-12-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2018-12-11 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-10 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-12-06 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-12-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-08-24 | (C) Draft Request Received |