MT HB126 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Increase fees on death and birth certificates
Title
Increase fees on death and birth certificates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-12 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-04 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-02 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2019-03-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2019-02-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2019-01-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2018-12-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2018-12-19 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2018-12-19 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-18 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-12-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-12-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-11-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |