MT HB134 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise school funding related to facilities
Title
Revise school funding related to facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-04-21 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2017-04-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-08 | Senate | (S) Taken from 2nd Reading; Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2017-03-07 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Education |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2017-01-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Education |
2016-12-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2016-12-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2016-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-11-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-11-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-11-15 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-10-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-10-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-10-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-09-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |